DC B21-0788 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 4 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-04 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 4 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-04 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill designates the 700 block of 24th Street, N.E., in Ward 5, as Janice Wade McCree Way.
Title
Janice Wade Mccree Way Designation Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 19, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0788 |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0788 Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2016-06-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |