DC B21-0658 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 4 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-04 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 4 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-04 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 19, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill extends the time in which the Mayor may dispose of certain District-owned real property known as the Strand Theater, located at 5131 Nannie Helen Burroughs Avenue, NE to October 6, 2016.
Title
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of The Strand Theater Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 19, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-12-06 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0658 |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0658 Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |