DC B21-0650 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0154 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 21-154 adds waste heat from combined and sanitary sewage systems, and effluence from wastewater treatment to the list of Tier 1 renewable sources; raises the renewable portfolio and solar requirements to 50% and 5% by the year 2032, respectively; increases financial penalties for electricity suppliers who fail to comply with the renewable energy portfolio standard for the applicable year; and establishes a program within the Department of Energy and the Environment to assist low-income households, seniors, nonprofits, and small local businesses increase their access to the benefits of solar power. The program is required to reduce by at least 50% the electric bills of at least 100,000 of the District's low-income households with high energy burdens by December 31, 2032.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Portfolio Standard Expansion Amendment Act Of 2016

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-28 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-21CouncilLaw Number L21-0154 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
2016-08-24CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
2016-08-05CouncilAct A21-0466 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10138
2016-07-25CouncilSigned with Act Number A21-0466
2016-07-25CouncilEnacted with Act Number A21-0466
2016-07-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 25, 2016
2016-06-28CouncilAmendment (Cheh)
2016-06-28CouncilFinal Reading
2016-06-07CouncilFirst Reading
2016-06-01CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2016-06-01CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B21-0650
2016-05-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2016-05-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2016-04-22CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2016-03-04CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B21-0650 Published in the DC Register
2016-03-01CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2016-03-01CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback