DC B21-0645 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it expands the number of agency heads to which the Executive Service Public Safety Pay Schedule applies. It repeals statutory provisions regarding certain former salaries and establishes the compensation level for the Chief of the Metropolitan Police Department and the Chancellor of the District of Columbia Public Schools.
Title
Executive Service Pay Schedule Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0645 Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0645 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/35404/B21-0645-Introduction.pdf |