DC B21-0402 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides real property tax relief for Lots 802 and 809 in Square 2287, owned by Ingleside Presbyterian Retirement Community, Inc. for property located at 3050 Military Road, N.W. It also requires that all real property taxes, interest, penalties, fees and other related charges assessed against the property owned, be forgiven for a period beginning with tax year 2015 through the effective date of this act.
Renamed by Committee to "Continuing Care Retirement Community Exemption Amendment Act of 2016."
Title
Ingleside Presbyterian Retirement Community, Inc. Real Property Tax Exemption And Real Property Tax Relief Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-20 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 26, 2017 |
2016-12-20 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-12-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2016-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0402 |
2016-04-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-04-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-03-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-10-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2015-10-02 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0402 Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-25 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |