DC B21-0143 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Law Number L21-0108 Effective from May 12, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 21-108 prohibits the manufacture, sale, or distribution of any children's product or residential upholstered furniture containing carcinogenic flame retardants or chemicals known to be carcinogenic to humans. It authorizes the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs to request and obtain a certificate of compliance from manufacturers, who must then respond within 45 days of the request. This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carcinogenic Flame Retardant Prohibition Amendment Act Of 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-12CouncilLaw Number L21-0108 Effective from May 12, 2016
2016-03-31CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2016-03-25CouncilAct A21-0336 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 4315
2016-03-17CouncilSigned with Act Number A21-0336
2016-03-17CouncilEnacted with Act Number A21-0336
2016-03-09CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2016
2016-03-01CouncilFinal Reading CC
2016-02-02CouncilFirst Reading
2016-02-02CouncilAmendment (Cheh)
2016-01-13CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2016-01-13CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B21-0143
2015-09-29CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2015-09-11CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2015-03-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B21-0143 Published in the DC Register
2015-03-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2015-03-17CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback