DC B20-0980 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-28 - Act A20-0478 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12127, Expires on Feb 10, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-28 - Act A20-0478 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12127, Expires on Feb 10, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of The Strand Theater Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Extension Of Time To Dispose Of The Strand Theater Second Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-28 | Council | Act A20-0478 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12127, Expires on Feb 10, 2015 |
2014-11-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-11-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0478, Expires on Feb 10, 2015 |
2014-11-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Nov 18, 2014 |
2014-10-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-10-23 | Council | B20-0980 Introduced by Councilmember Alexander at Office of the Secretary |