DC B20-0874 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-08 - Act A20-0384 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8043, Expires on Oct 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-08 - Act A20-0384 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8043, Expires on Oct 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Interest Arbitration Award And Compensation Agreement Between The District Of Columbia Fire And Emergency Medical Services Department And Local 36 International Association Of Firefighters (compensation Unit 4) Emergency Approval Act Of 2014
Title
Interest Arbitration Award And Compensation Agreement Between The District Of Columbia Fire And Emergency Medical Services Department And Local 36 International Association Of Firefighters (compensation Unit 4) Emergency Approval Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment in Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-14 - Council - Amendment in Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | Council | Act A20-0384 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8043, Expires on Oct 28, 2014 |
2014-07-30 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-07-16 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 30, 2014 |
2014-07-14 | Council | B20-0874 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |