DC B20-0461 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Law Number L20-0148 Effective from Dec 17, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - Law Number L20-0148 Effective from Dec 17, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage License Issuance Amendment Act Of 2013
Title
Marriage License Issuance Amendment Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] | Cnc. David Catania [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-14 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Law Number L20-0148 Effective from Dec 17, 2014 |
2014-09-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Dec 17, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | Council | Act A20-0417 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 8314 |
2014-08-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-08-01 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0417 |
2014-07-25 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Aug 8, 2014 |
2014-07-14 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2014-06-24 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2014-06-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0461 |
2013-12-19 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0461 |
2013-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-09-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0461 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-09-17 | Council | B20-0461 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso and Wells at Committee of the Whole |