CT SB00752 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To (1) increase the publication of data on housing production; (2) develop projections of regional affordable housing needs; (3) require municipal planning for reaching recommended apportionment of affordable housing needs; (4) involve the state and other stakeholders in developing regional housing need estimates for municipalities; (5) increase data transparency on subsidized housing investments; (6) provide housing authorities with the option to expand housing authority jurisdiction; (7) increase the amount of funding used on mobility counseling; and (8) integrate subsidized housing by requiring marketing across lines of race and income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Study Of Connecticut's Housing Inventory And Current And Future Housing Needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-24SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-24SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-24SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-24SenateJoint Favorable
2017-05-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-17SenateRemoved from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2017-04-21SenateMoved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
2017-03-22SenateFile Number 147
2017-03-22SenateSenate Calendar Number 112
2017-03-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-03-22SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
2017-03-08SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-07SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2017-02-23SenatePublic Hearing 02/28
2017-02-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Housing
2017-02-16SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-01-31SenateVote to Draft
2017-01-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Housing

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback