CO SR005 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recognition of "Single Parents' Day".
Title
Single Parents' Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |