CO SR004 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of March 10, 2020, as "Colorado Aerospace Day".
Title
Aerospace Day
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/10/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |