CO SM001 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Senator Hugh C. Fowler.
Title
Memorialize Former Senator Hugh C. Fowler
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |