CO SJR048 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Vietnam Veterans Resolution
Title
Vietnam Veterans Resolution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-29 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/724551C65406006B872577110076F3AA?Open |