CO SJR044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - House Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - House Third Reading Passed
Summary
Arkansas Valley Correctional Facility 25th Anniv
Title
Arkansas Valley Correctional Facility 25th Anniv
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-03 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2328CB15F1E39BB872579DE007A311B?Open |