CO SJR009 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Summary
Declare Fiscal Emergency Tobacco Tax
Title
Declare Fiscal Emergency Tobacco Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Joint Resolution 11-009 to the full Senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-06-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-15 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | |
2011-04-08 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |