CO SJR002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Request For Comprehensive Tax Study
Title
Request For Comprehensive Tax Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved that Senate Joint Resolution 002 be recommended to the Full Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-01-27 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-01-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-20 | House Third Reading Laid Over to 01/22/2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-01-19 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs |