CO SJM005 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Senator MaryAnne Tebedo.
Title
Memorializing Senator MaryAnne Tebedo
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/09/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/22/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sjm24-005 |
Text | https://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2024A/bills/2024a_sjm005_01.pdf |