CO SJM001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - House Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - House Third Reading Passed
Summary
Memorialize Frank O. Weddig
Title
Memorialize Frank O. Weddig
Sponsors
Sen. Morgan Carroll [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2013 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B8CF67207510FFF487257B10007D4B57?Open |