CO SCR003 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Submitting to the registered electors of the state of Colorado an amendment to the Colorado constitution concerning changing the industrial hemp definition from a constitutional definition to a statutory definition.
Title
Change Industrial Hemp To A Statutory THC Limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Cncrnt Res (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Full House of Representatives (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer SCR18-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer SCR18-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Full House of Representatives (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer SCR18-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer SCR18-003 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |