CO SCR002 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unreasonable Searches Of Electronic Data Devices
Title
Unreasonable Searches Of Electronic Data Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer SCR14-002 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone SCR14-002 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Concurrent Resolution 14-002 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone SCR14-002 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Concurrent Resolution 14-002 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-04-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |