CO SB300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the commissioner of insurance to implement programs to address the rising costs of providing health care coverage to high-risk individuals in the state, and, in connection therewith, directing the commissioner to study issues related to the implementation of such programs.
Title
High-risk Health Care Coverage Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C), as amended by the conceptual amendment. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 17-300, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |