CO SB291 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the transfer of forty million dollars to the Colorado economic development fund for the purpose of providing grants to businesses and for investing in economic development opportunities in response to the negative economic impacts of the coronavirus pandemic from the newly created economic recovery and relief cash fund which fund consists of certain money that the state receives from the federal coronavirus state fiscal recovery fund, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Recovery And Relief Cash Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.003) (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-291, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-07SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-06-04HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-06-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-291
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_291_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_291_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_291_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_291_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_291_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_291_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB291_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB291_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB291_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB291_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb291_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0291_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5229f028f29e7673872586e400022a01-sb21-291-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5229f028f29e7673872586e400022a01-sb21-291-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5229f028f29e7673872586e400022a01-sb21-291-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-291vote5d363d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f818805bfdcb1c13872586e90057a25a-sb21-291-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f818805bfdcb1c13872586e90057a25a-sb21-291-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-291vote5a75f8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-291vote5a8947
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-291vote5a5f96
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-291vote142478
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-291vote18f8af

Bill Comments 750

feedback