CO SB283 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Implement Amendment 64 Consensus Recommendations
Title
Implement Amendment 64 Consensus Recommendations
Sponsors
Sen. Cheri Jahn [D] | Rep. Jenise May [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |