CO SB266 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive revision of statutes in the Colorado Revised Statutes, as amended, and, in connection therewith, amending or repealing obsolete, imperfect, and inoperative law to preserve the legislative intent, effect, and meaning of the law.
Title
Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Matt Soper [R] | Rep. Michael Weissman [D] |
Sen. John Cooke [R] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] | Sen. Paul Lundeen [R] | Sen. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Leslie Herod [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Sen. Kevin Van Winkle [R] | Rep. Tracey Bernett [D] |
Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R] | Rep. Monica Duran [D] | Sen. Thomas Exum [D] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] |
Rep. Iman Jodeh [D] | Sen. Rod Pelton [R] | Rep. Andres Pico [R] | Rep. Mary Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.002) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-266 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-266 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.002) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-266 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |