CO SB265 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state income tax benefits for amounts contributed to a child care savings account.
Title
Child Care Savings Account Income Tax Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Owen Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 18-265 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-265, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-265, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-265 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-265 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment K]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-265, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-265, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |