CO SB261 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Utility's Public Notice Of Schedule Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility's Public Notice Of Schedule Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2015-05-18SenateSent to the Governor
2015-05-18SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2015-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-20SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-04-02SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596/$FILE/261_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596/$FILE/261_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596/$FILE/261_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596/$FILE/261_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596/$FILE/261_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/5A0E208A67A2675787257DFD005E2596/$FILE/261_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E09BC818280A4B5487257E2D006E76F3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A6156A6259186C2E87257E37006111F5

Bill Comments

feedback