CO SB260 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementing a sunrise review of new educational services under the private occupational school division in the department of higher education, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Sunrise Review New Private Occupational Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Owen Hill [R] | Rep. Dave Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 18-260 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-260 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Postpone Senate Bill 18-260 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |