CO SB260 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Product Testing
Title
Medical Marijuana Product Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-260, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-04 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance |
2015-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |