CO SB256 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning permitting regulation of firearms by local governing bodies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Regulation Of Firearms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.018) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.017) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.015) (Y: 25 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.013) (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.011) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-256 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-19 Governor Signed
2021-06-15 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2021-06-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-05-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-24HouseHouse Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
2021-05-18SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-17SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-14SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-11SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-256
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_256_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_256_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_256_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_256_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_256_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_256_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.017.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.015.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.018.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB256_L.019.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb256_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cabc1493914ceaf1872586d200724f0d-sb21-256-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote5b0aa3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cabc1493914ceaf1872586d200724f0d-sb21-256-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cabc1493914ceaf1872586d200724f0d-sb21-256-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cabc1493914ceaf1872586d200724f0d-sb21-256-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3621a226439c02b6872586df007ab505-sb21-256-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote7789e0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote77adbe
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote7755b8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote77f932
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote7827bb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote77d6c9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote718c0e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote10eae2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote103c23
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote10c93d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote1052b4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-256vote1109cd

Bill Comments 750

feedback