CO SB255 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of electronic formats in the issuance of certificates of title for vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Documents And Signatures Vehicle Titles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 18-255 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06 Governor Signed
2018-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-08SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-05-03HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2018-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-17SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-255
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_255_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_255_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_255_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_255_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_255_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_255_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-04-23t141409z-sb18-255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-255vote579e02
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-05-03t112905z-sb18-255-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2018a2018-05-03t112905z-sb18-255-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-255vote5778a8
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-255vote57c544
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-255vote57a0d7
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-255vote0c7511
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-255vote0c69e9

Bill Comments

feedback