CO SB253 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the effective date to transition the department of revenue's CSTARS account to the department of revenue's DRIVES vehicle services account.
Title
CSTARS Account Transfer To DRIVES Account Effective Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |