CO SB250 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drug Sentencing Changes
Title
Drug Sentencing Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to add the bill number in places where it is missing in the bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to add the bill number in places where it is missing in the bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to add the bill number in places where it is missing in the bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to add the bill number in places where it is missing in the bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-250, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-05-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |