CO SB245 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning granting the department of human services rule-making authority to amend the length of time permitted to satisfy administrative appeal requirements for the food stamp program in order to comply with federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Time Requirements For Food Stamp Appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-245, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-245 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-22SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-245
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_245_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_245_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_245_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_245_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_245_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_245_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1056f4198c0993d4872583e00070d005-sb19-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-245vote581c5a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/980757dba47526c0872583eb007e3d07-sb19-245-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-245vote5c36fa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-245vote730237
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-245vote731137
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/980757dba47526c0872583eb007e3d07-sb19-245-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback