CO SB245 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create The Colorado Firefighting Air Corps

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create The Colorado Firefighting Air Corps

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-245 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-245, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-245, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Page 2 line 15, change "shall" to "may" The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.001 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Page 2 line 15, change "shall" to "may" The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion failed on a vote of 3-4. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-245 to the Committee on Appropriations, unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-245 to the Committee on Appropriations, unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-05SenateGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-21SenateSent to the Governor
2013-05-06SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-05-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-05-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-05-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
2013-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2013-04-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245sapp_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245ag_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/779A297FF0DAC4DB87257AEE005848DB/$FILE/245_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AAD576AEC8928D9C87257B4A007619B4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C660AB4E1B55154787257B5200507962
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CC4B473BFCF0FCE87257B5200508610
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/686885DF32F77A2A87257B520050B724
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/27E99EE2D94A6AAE87257B52004E0426
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9F6FCE31D896381C87257B5E0067E8A9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D1A62BFB64FD570787257B60004C43B9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C16F86D042D51F5987257B5E0067960E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AAD576AEC8928D9C87257B4A007619B4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C660AB4E1B55154787257B5200507962
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CC4B473BFCF0FCE87257B5200508610
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/686885DF32F77A2A87257B520050B724
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/27E99EE2D94A6AAE87257B52004E0426
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C16F86D042D51F5987257B5E0067960E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9F6FCE31D896381C87257B5E0067E8A9
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D1A62BFB64FD570787257B60004C43B9

Bill Comments

feedback