CO SB244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning statutory changes to implement changes to the workplace policies of the general assembly, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Management Of Legislative Workplace Conduct

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-244 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-244 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-244 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-244, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-244, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Legislative Council
2019-04-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-244
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_244_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_244_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_244_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_244_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_244_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_244_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e2c8c510e32cbda4872583e50010593c-sb19-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ff95b4e4a5a4c1ec872583e7004ac55e-sb19-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33e64eddbeb7bf9b872583e8004e66a5-sb19-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/33e64eddbeb7bf9b872583e8004e66a5-sb19-244-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-244vote646ced
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c6c7bfa4523c01c4872583ec006fd35e-sb19-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/507d50ce9da45096872583ed004d40b9-sb19-244-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-244vote56c0c9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e2c8c510e32cbda4872583e50010593c-sb19-244-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback