CO SB244 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Substance Abuse Trend And Response Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Abuse Trend And Response Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-244, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-244 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-244 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-28SenateGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-21SenateSent to the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-04-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-29SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-15SenateIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2013-04-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-08SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/4BEA96E6F936475787257B27006168DD/$FILE/244_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/51BDF8AF00BA24BA87257B470079F91B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/419AEF9BD534921C87257B56007C335B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/805893E7B016DFB787257B56007C2750
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/51BDF8AF00BA24BA87257B470079F91B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/805893E7B016DFB787257B56007C2750
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/419AEF9BD534921C87257B56007C335B

Bill Comments

feedback