CO SB242 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adult Dental Benefit Medicaid
Title
Adult Dental Benefit Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed on a vote of 8-4. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed on a vote of 8-4. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed on a vote of 8-4. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-242 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |