CO SB241 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Industrial Hemp Growers Registration DOA
Title
Industrial Hemp Growers Registration DOA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Place on consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Place on consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Place on consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-241, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. Place on consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-241 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-29 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |