CO SB238 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation Hearing Aid Providers Sellers
Title
Regulation Hearing Aid Providers Sellers
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Tochtrop [D] | Rep. Su Ryden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW, J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 5-1. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW, J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 5-1. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW, J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 5-1. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW, J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 5-1. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-30 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |