CO SB234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the functions of professional review committees, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Professional Review Committees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-234 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-234 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-234 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-234 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-234
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_234_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_234_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_234_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_234_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_234_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_234_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dc0ef34d5b5fa522872583e800085b3c-sb19-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b4abd8bc085e13bb872583e9000a064e-sb19-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-234vote082b4b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-234vote086f9f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54d12a596384bc57872583ed007b6d06-sb19-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8a5c3d5edea52781872583ed006e6b2a-sb19-234-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-234vote7370b8

Bill Comments

feedback