CO SB229 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-13)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the rural jump-start zone grant program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Jump-start Zone Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-229, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-229 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer Senate Bill 21-229 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-229 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-229 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-229, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 21-229, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Governor Signed
2021-06-10 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-24HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to Finance
2021-05-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
2021-03-31SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-229
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_229_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_229_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_229_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_229_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_229_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_229_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB229_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB229_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB229_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb229_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb229_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0229_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0229_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb229_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb5127144ba01c48872586c600581343-sb21-229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb5127144ba01c48872586c600581343-sb21-229-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/eb5127144ba01c48872586c600581343-sb21-229-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7c8bcdf0932646b0872586cc0075a525-sb21-229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1ee9bea27d332af4872586d5004f46ab-sb21-229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-229vote58dea5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a7051e25355974d9872586df007251bf-sb21-229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/504e091a4505b429872586e20063a6d6-sb21-229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/431e734c19be529c872586e300518a44-sb21-229-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/431e734c19be529c872586e300518a44-sb21-229-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-229vote7cfa33
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-229vote58c721
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-229vote58dab1

Bill Comments 750

feedback