CO SB227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
concerning the identification of certain individuals with a substance use disorder; and making an appropriation.
Title
Harm Reduction Substance Use Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-227 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-227 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-227 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-227, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-227, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-227 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-227 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-227 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-227, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment O). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment N). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-227, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |