CO SB224 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Our Rivers Motor Vehicle License Plate
Title
Protect Our Rivers Motor Vehicle License Plate
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Rep. Millie Hamner [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-224 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-05-02 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-05-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2013-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |