CO SB223 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the location of a department of revenue administrative hearing.
Title
Location of Department of Revenue Administrative Hearing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-223 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |