CO SB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the funding of Colorado water conservation board projects, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
CO Water Conservation Board Construction Fund Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-221 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-221 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-221 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 19-221, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |