CO SB217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning healthcare provider liens related to charges for medical care provided to a person injured as a result of the negligence or wrongful acts of another person.
Title
Healthcare Provider Liens
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Rod Bockenfeld [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Joint - CC_SB19-217_2019A: Adopt the First Report of First Conference Committee on SB19-217, CLSB217.001. (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.055 (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.054 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.051 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.050 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Amend amendment L.055, page 1, line 2, after "exceed", insert "one hundred twenty percent". (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.049 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-217 to the Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.039) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.055 (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.054 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.051 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.050 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Amend amendment L.055, page 1, line 2, after "exceed", insert "one hundred twenty percent". (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.049 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-217 to the Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.039) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.023 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.021 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.022 (Attachment F). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-217, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-24 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |