CO SB215 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of open educational resources at public institutions of higher education, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use Of Open Educational Resources In Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-215 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-215 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-27SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-14HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-13HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2021-04-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-215
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_215_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_215_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_215_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_215_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_215_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_215_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb215_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0215_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a23004af91c3534d872586af004b52c6-sb21-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-215vote5e0a1d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7e6c0615f5f4b2e1872586b6004fba23-sb21-215-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-215vote6c6199

Bill Comments 750

feedback