CO SB215 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Disposition Of Legal Marijuana Related Revenue

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposition Of Legal Marijuana Related Revenue

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-215, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-215, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-215 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-15SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-15SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-05-07SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2014-05-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-05-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-05-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-05-06HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2014-05-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2014-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2014-05-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2014-04-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A9002841A8B1E5A087257CB4007E3F99/$FILE/215_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D563283D95D1E77387257CCA006149F5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BE666390218117E587257CD0005CD43A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A0B0B56DC76CB8D287257CD0005CF81A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/87DC88AA9899F2EC87257CD0005D2949
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CA264E1A975F90987257CD0006E8B02
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/991350A6DB05D98287257CD0006E7864

Bill Comments

feedback