CO SB213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for automated driving systems to control motor vehicles throughout Colorado.
Title
Automated Driving Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Joint - CC_2017A: Adopt the first report od the first conference committee on SB 17-213 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Motion Adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Joint - CC_2017A: Adopt the first report od the first conference committee on SB 17-213 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Motion Adopted (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.019 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.017 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-213, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-11 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-04-10 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/03/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |